VA HB949 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority (NVTA); membership composition. Increases from 17 to 18 the membership of the NVTA and provides that the additional non-legislative citizen member represent towns that receive funds for urban highway systems.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority (NVTA); membership composition.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103101D |