VA HB949 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Pavement sealants containing coal tar prohibited. Prohibits the sale and distribution of any pavement sealant that contains coal tar on or after July 1, 2022, except that a retailer may continue to sell any existing inventory that remains in stock on that date. The bill prohibits the use of such sealants beginning July 1, 2023. The bill subjects any person who violates either prohibition to a civil penalty of $250, to be paid into the Virginia Environmental Emergency Response Fund.
Title
Pavement sealants; sealants containing coal tar prohibited.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100399D |