VA HB975 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public service corporations and companies; governmental utility corporation. Clarifies that (i) property may be taken by eminent domain by a public corporation for sanitary sewer, water and stormwater facilities, or transportation facilities and (ii) a government utility corporation (a county or municipality, or entity or agency thereof, that provides or operates specified authorized utility services) shall be considered to be acting as a public service corporation or public service company with regard to the provision of such authorized utility services for the purposes of any taking of private property by eminent domain in accordance with the Constitution of Virginia.
Title
Governmental utility corporation; acting as public service corporation or public service company.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626) | |
2012-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 626 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB975ER) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-08 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105798D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB975S1 | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105798D-S1 | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105798D-S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB975H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105040D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105040D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103428D |