VA HB982 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-25 - Senate: Continued to 2009 in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-25 - Senate: Continued to 2009 in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
Summary
Concealed handgun permits; access to permittee information. Protects from public disclosure permittee names and descriptive information held by the Department of State Police for purposes of entry into the Virginia Criminal Information Network. However, the information would still be available to law-enforcement agencies, officers, and agents in the course of law-enforcement duties, and non-identifying statistical information would be available to the general public. The bill also prohibits a clerk of court from disseminating any personal identifiable information, such as address, phone, number, or social security number, but allows the clerk, in his discretion, to make available the names of persons issued concealed handgun permits by the court. This bill incorporates
Title
Concealed handgun permit applications; access to personal information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-25 | Senate: Continued to 2009 in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Passed House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 085987660-EH1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB982EH1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Amendment by Delegate Ware, R.L. agreed to | |
2008-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 085987660-H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 085987660-H1 | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 085936660 |
Same As/Similar To
HB370 (Similar To) 2008-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety (HB982-Nutter) by voice vote
HB653 (Similar To) 2008-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety (HB982-Nutter) by voice vote
HB843 (Similar To) 2008-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety (HB982-Nutter) by voice vote
HB653 (Similar To) 2008-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety (HB982-Nutter) by voice vote
HB843 (Similar To) 2008-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety (HB982-Nutter) by voice vote
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB982 |