VA HB991 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter schools; employees. Provides that public charter school personnel, at the discretion of the local school board, need not be employees of the local school board or boards granting the charter. Charter school personnel remain subject to background check and fingerprinting requirements.
Title
Charter schools; school personnel need not be employees of local school board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Education | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102196D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 212.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB991 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB991+hil |