VA HJR140 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ140ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ140ER)
Summary
Commending Juanita Blick Evans-Fells. Commends Juanita Blick Evans-Fells on her outstanding achievement as the first African-American female television news reporter in Petersburg and for her faithful and generous spirit of service to the people of that city and the surrounding localities.
Title
Commending Juanita Blick Evans-Fells.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ140ER) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Received | |
2008-01-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-11 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-01-11 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-10 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 084198484 | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/08 084198484 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ140 |