VA HJR179 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Honorable Kathy J. Byron.
Title
Commending the Honorable Kathy J. Byron.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reading waived |
2024-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-02-15 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24103995D |
Same As/Similar To
HR167 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill text as passed House (HR167ER)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HJ179 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HJ179+hil |