VA HJR196 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ196ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ196ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Public and private educational placements of students with disabilities; report. Directs the Commission of Youth to study the use of federal, state, and local funds for the public and private educational placements of students with disabilities. In conducting its study, the Commission on Youth shall (i) examine the use of CSA and Medicaid funds for private day and private residential special education placements; (ii) gather local and statewide data on the extent to which youth are placed in settings that are segregated from nondisabled students; (iii) determine the feasibility and cost-effectiveness of more integrated alternatives to provide special education services to students including, but not limited to, those students with intellectual and developmental disabilities currently in segregated settings in the Commonwealth; and (iv) consider any other matters as it deems appropriate to meet the objectives of this study.
Title
Students with disabilities; Commission on Youth to study use of funds for educational placements.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ196ER) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading waived |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ196H2 |
2014-02-05 | House | Substitute by Delegate Adams agreed to 14104850D-H2 |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee substitute rejected 14104686D-H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Floor substitute printed 14104850D-H2 (Adams) |
2014-02-05 | House | Taken up |
2014-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104686D-H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103491D |
2014-01-22 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Education
Persons with Disabilities
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Education
Persons with Disabilities
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports