VA HJR236 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ236ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ236ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Lauren Shifflett.
Title
Commending Lauren Shifflett.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ236ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-17 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22104827D |