VA HJR237 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ237ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ237ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Oriana Robertson Hargrove.
Title
Celebrating the life of Oriana Robertson Hargrove.
Sponsors
Del. John Cox [R] | Del. William Howell [R] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. William Janis [R] |
Del. Harvey Morgan [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Lacey Putney [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ237ER) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Received | |
2010-02-12 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-08 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10104335D | |
2010-02-08 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10104335D | |
2010-02-04 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10104335D |