VA HJR245 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ245ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ245ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Month. Designates November, in 2016 and in each succeeding year, as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Month; designating as November 2016, and each succeeding year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ245ER) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reading waived |
2016-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-02-15 | House | Taken up |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104771D |
2016-02-04 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |