VA HJR245 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ245ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ245ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the life and legacy of Leslie Devan Smith, Jr.
Title
Commemorating the life and legacy of Leslie Devan Smith, Jr.
Sponsors
Del. Ronnie Campbell [R] | Sen. Emily Brewer [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. James Morefield [R] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Chris Runion [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ245ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed by until Monday, February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20108231D |