VA HJR281 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ281ER)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ281ER)
Summary
Commending Chris Long.
Title
Commending Chris Long.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ281ER) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Received | |
2008-02-01 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-01 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-25 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 088637752 | |
2008-01-24 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 088637752 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ281 |