VA HJR289 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ289ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ289ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending United Methodist Family Services.
Title
Commending United Methodist Family Services.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. James Edmunds [R] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Nancy Guy [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ289ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-24 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2020-02-24 | House | Received |
2020-02-20 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20107363D |