VA HJR302 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ302ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ302ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of William J. Wilde.
Title
Celebrating the life of William J. Wilde.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ302ER) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House |
2016-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-02-16 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16103991D |