VA HJR31 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; staffing Department of Corrections; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study staffing levels and employment conditions at the Department of Corrections.
Title
Corrections, Department of; JLARC to study staffing levels and employment conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103182D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HJ31 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HJ31+hil |