VA HJR31 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-10)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ31ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-10)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ31ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the assassination of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. The resolution is a recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission. The resolution is identical to SJ 38.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the assassination of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ31ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18104152D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ31E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104152D |