VA HJR341 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ341ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ341ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Oscar F. Smith High School football team.
Title
Commending the Oscar F. Smith High School football team.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Wren Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ341ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-03-03 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22106241D |