VA HJR35 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR35
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Taxation; tax policy options for reforming the litter tax; report. Directs the Department of Taxation, in conjunction with the Department of Environmental Quality, to study tax policy options for reforming the litter tax.
Title
Litter tax; Department of Taxation, et al., to study tax policy options for reforming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101515D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR35 (Carry Over) 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HJ35 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HJ35+hil |