VA HJR406 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ406ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ406ER)
Summary
Commending Mount Calvary Baptist Church on the occasion of its 115th anniversary.
Title
Commending Mount Calvary Baptist Church on the occasion of its 115th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ406ER) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Received | |
2008-02-19 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-19 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-02-19 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-02-19 | House: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2008-02-18 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 089069756 | |
2008-02-15 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 089069756 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ406 |