VA HJR427 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ427ER)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ427ER)
Summary
Commending Patricia Herr.
Title
Commending Patricia Herr.
Sponsors
Del. Charles Caputo [D] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Joe May [R] | Del. David Poisson [D] |
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ427ER) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Received | |
2008-02-22 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-22 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-02-20 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 084871688 | |
2008-02-19 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 084871688 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ427 |