VA HJR427 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ427ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ427ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Briar Woods High School football team.
Title
Commending the Briar Woods High School football team.
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Comstock [R] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] | Del. Joe May [R] |
Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. David Ramadan [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ427ER) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12105071D | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Received | |
2012-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-22 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12105071D |