VA HJR51 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ51ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ51ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; DOE, DBHDS, and DSS; feasibility of developing Study; DOE, DBHDS, and DSS; feasibility of developing an early childhood mental health consultation program for all early care and education programs; report. Directs the Departments of Education, Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and Social Services to jointly study the feasibility of developing an early childhood mental health consultation program available to all early care and education programs serving children from birth to five years of age. The Departments shall complete their meetings by November 30, 2020, and shall submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an executive summary and a report of their findings and recommendations for publication as a House or Senate document by the first day of the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Early childhood mental health consultation program; DBHDS, DOE, and DSS to study developing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ51ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-10 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104885D |