VA HJR56 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission; common interest communities; report. Requests the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the overall efficiency and effectiveness of common interest communities, with special regard to the accountability structure available for the enforcement of the provisions in the governing documents of associations subject to the Property Owners' Association Act.
Title
Common interest communities; Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Rules |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104138D |
Subjects
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Property Owners
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Property Owners
Study Commissions Committees and Reports