VA HJR7 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ7ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ7ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Postural Orthostatic Tachycardia Syndrome Awareness Day. Designates October 25, in 2024 and in each succeeding year, as Postural Orthostatic Tachycardia Syndrome Awareness Day in Virginia.
Title
Postural Orthostatic Tachycardia Syndrome Awareness Day; designating as October 25, 2024.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] | Del. Michael Jones [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ7ER) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reading waived |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ7H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106873D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Taken up |
2024-02-01 | House | Incorporates HJ37 (Delaney) |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106873D-H1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101477D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR37 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Incorporated by Rules