VA HJR81 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ81ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ81ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week. Designates the first week in May, in 2024 and in each succeeding year, as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week in Virginia. Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week. Designates the first week in May, in 2024 and in each succeeding year, as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week in Virginia.
Title
Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week; designating as the first week in May 2024 & each year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ81ER) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reading waived |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 24105169D-E |
2024-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ81E |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-06 | House | Taken up |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105169D |