VA HR215 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Bill text as passed House (HR215ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Bill text as passed House (HR215ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Ronnie Jerome Everette, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Ronnie Jerome Everette, Jr.
Sponsors
Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Bonita Anthony [D] | Del. Chad Green [R] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House (HR215ER) |
2024-03-08 | House | Agreed to by House |
2024-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-03-08 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed by until Friday, March 8, 2024 |
2024-02-26 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24101858D |