VA SB1 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relief for purchaser of property sold at treasurers' sales; Charles L. Kingrea. Provides relief to Charles L. Kingrea. In 1970 and 1971, Mr. Kingrea purchased real property in Floyd County pursuant to the treasurer's delinquent tax sale. Under law at the time, Mr. Kingrea would have been eligible after a number of years to make application to obtain clear title; however, a statute that would have permitted him to continue the process to completion was repealed in 1984 pursuant to the recodification of Title 58 of the Code of Virginia because it was deemed "obsolete." The bill would allow Mr. Kingrea to complete the process to obtain clear title to the properties. The bill has a July 1, 2014, sunset clause. This bill also contains an emergency clause.
Title
Relief for purchaser of property sold at treasurers' sales; Charles L. Kingrea.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 444 (effective 4/11/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2009-11-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2009-11-16 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/10 10100118D |