VA SB109 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Green Public Buildings Act. Requires executive branch agencies and institutions entering the design phase for construction of a new building greater than 5,000 gross square feet in size, or renovating such a building where the cost of renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building, to meet standards at least as stringent as the LEED or Green Globes standards. Exemptions from the requirement may be granted by the Director of the Department of General Services upon a finding of special circumstances that make construction or renovation to the standards impracticable.
Title
Green Public Buildings Act; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-03-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10104696D-ES1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB109ES1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104696D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104696D-S1 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-06 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100337D |