VA SB111 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-16 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB369-Watkins) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-16 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB369-Watkins) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Indigent defendants; right to ex parte hearing for appointment of experts in capital cases. Provides that an indigent defendant who has been charged with a capital offense may move for the appointment of experts to assist in the preparation of his defense. The court shall hold an ex parte hearing on such a motion and may order the appointment of an expert. The expert's work product is protected by attorney-client privilege; however, the defendant shall comply with the discovery rules set forth in the Rules of the Supreme Court. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Indigent defendants; right to ex parte hearing for appointment of experts in capital cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-16 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB369-Watkins) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-03 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080206272 |
Same As/Similar To
SB369 (Similar To) 2010-02-09 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB111 |