VA SB111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sanctions with Unified Rapid Enforcement (SURE) probation program created. Creates a specialized probation program available to offenders who are on probation pursuant to a suspended sentence and have not been convicted of a violent felony. The program provides for immediate arrest of a probation violator whose violation is not another crime. The offender would then be subject to a minimum of three to 10 days in jail, with the terms of confinement escalating for each subsequent offense. Upon a fourth violation the offender would become ineligible for the SURE program. The program is to be administered by the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission as a pilot program in no more than 10 jurisdictions.
Title
Sanctions with Unified Rapid Enforcement (SURE); created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-29 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-27 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105705D-H1 | |
2012-02-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB111S3 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Howell agreed to 12105312D-S3 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12105171D-S2 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12104816D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105312D-S3 (Howell) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105171D-S2 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104816D-S1 | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101833D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 303.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |