VA SB113 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority (NVTA); membership composition. Increases from 17 to 18 the membership of the NVTA and provides that the additional nonlegislative citizen member represent towns that receive funds for urban highway systems.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority; membership composition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100883D |