VA SB115 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local surcharge on retail sales of fuels. Authorizes each city and county to impose a one percent surcharge on the retail price of motor fuels sold at retail in the city or county. The Tax Commissioner would collect the surcharge in the same manner that he collects the retail sales and use tax. Revenues from the surcharge would be used solely for funding of roads or highways in the urban or the secondary system of state highways.
Title
Surcharge on fuels sales; locality to impose a one percent surcharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Pursuant to Rule 20F | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Recommitted to Finance | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103339D |