VA SB143 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Railroad safety; civil penalties. Requires a crew of at least two qualified individuals on all trains, locomotives, or light engines used in connection with moving freight.
Title
Railroad safety; use of train, locomotive, etc., for movement of freight, minimum train crew.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB143ER) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (10-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB143S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106367D-S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106367D-S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101954D |
Same As/Similar To
HB385 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto