VA SB146 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sentence modification; felony. Amends provision that allows felony sentence modification prior to transfer to the Department of Corrections to allow sentence modification after transfer to the Department of Corrections pursuant to a motion for a sentence modification hearing agreed to by the attorney for the Commonwealth and the defendant.
Title
Felony sentence; suspension or modification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB146S1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104046D-S1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Incorporates SB33 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104046D-S1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100919D |
Same As/Similar To
SB33 (Similar To) 2014-01-15 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice