VA SB15 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Town of Ashland; ordinance requiring the cutting of grass. Adds the Town of Ashland to the list of localities permitted to provide by ordinance for the cutting of grass and weeds on property, whether vacant or occupied.
Title
Grass and weeds; adds Town of Ashland to list of localities authorized to require cutting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311) | |
2012-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB15ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Passed House (73-Y 24-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) | |
2011-12-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-12-22 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100324D |