VA SB154 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Applications for teacher licensure by reciprocity; military spouses; timeline for determination. Requires the Board of Education's licensure regulations to provide for licensure by reciprocity for any spouse of an active duty or reserve member of the Armed Forces of the United States or a member of the Virginia National Guard who has obtained a valid out-of-state license, with full credentials and without deficiencies, that is in force at the time the application for a Virginia license is received by the Department of Education. Current law requires such regulations to provide for licensure by reciprocity for any spouse of an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the Commonwealth. The bill requires such an individual to submit an official copy of the military permanent assignment orders of the individual's spouse as part of the complete application packet. The bill requires the Department to determine and communicate such individual's eligibility for licensure by reciprocity within 15 business days of receipt of the complete application packet.
Title
Teachers; licensure by reciprocity for military spouses, timeline for determination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 545 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB154ER) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102412D |
Same As/Similar To
HB230 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
HB230 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
HB230 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)