VA SB195 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Housing and Community Development; stakeholder advisory group; report. Directs the Board of Housing and Community Development (the Board) to convene a stakeholder advisory group including fire code officials to evaluate and recommend revisions to the Uniform Statewide Building Code to permit Group R-2 occupancies to be served by a single exit, provided that the building has not more than six stories above grade plane. The bill requires the stakeholder advisory group to submit its findings and recommendations to the Board and to the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology no later than December 1, 2024.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; Board of HCD to convene advisory group to evaluate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 385 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB195ER) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendments (96-Y 2-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee on Rules amendments agreed to |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute rejected 24108407D-H1 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108407D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (16-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24104899D-E |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB195E |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104899D |
Same As/Similar To
HB368 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Subjects
Building Code
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation