VA SB206 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
Summary
State-owned communications towers; broadband service. Requires state agencies to lease or convey a license or other interest in a state-owned communication tower for which they are responsible to qualified providers of wireless broadband service in order to deploy broadband Internet service in areas of the Commonwealth that do not have access to terrestrial broadband or radio frequency Internet service. The requirement is subject to the provider presenting a spectrum and certified structural analysis of the tower and proof that applicable local government requirements are satisfied. The conveyance shall require payment of such consideration as the Director of the Department of General Services deems appropriate and which is commensurate with the consideration paid for use of comparable space on similar towers. This bill is identical to
Title
Communication towers, state-owned; wireless broadband service in unserved areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB206ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB206H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081877560-H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 081877560-H1 | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB206S1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080142333-S1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080142333-S1 | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087730792 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1329 (Same As) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB206 |