VA SB208 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Family or household member; definition. Includes within the definition of a person's "family or household member" any individual who is currently or was formerly involved in a substantive, intimate dating relationship with the person; the existence of such a substantive relationship shall be determined based on (i) the length of the relationship, (ii) the nature of the relationship, and (iii) the frequency of interaction between the persons involved in the relationship. A casual relationship or ordinary fraternization in a business or social context does not constitute a dating relationship. Expanding the definition of "family or household member" implicates crimes for which a family or household member is a victim (e.g., assault and battery against a family member) and protective orders under which a person may be protected (e.g., protective orders in cases of family abuse).
Title
Family or household member; expands definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Senate: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Subject matter referred by letter to the Virginia Crime Commission pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104593D-S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103178D |