VA SB208 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Impact fees for residential development. Repeals provisions that limit existing impact fee authority to (i) localities that have established an urban transportation service district and (ii) areas outside of such service districts that are zoned for agricultural use and that are being subdivided for by-right residential development. The effect of the repeal will be to make the existing impact fee provisions available for use by any locality that includes within its comprehensive plan a calculation of the capital costs of public facilities necessary to serve residential uses.
Title
Impact fees; residential development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Recommitted to Local Government |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Local Government (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100268D |