VA SB208 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0873)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0873)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mechanics' liens; right to withhold payment. Specifies that the use of funds paid to a general contractor or subcontractor and used by such contractor or subcontractor before paying all amounts due for labor performed or material furnished gives rise to a civil cause of action for a party who is owed such funds. The bill further specifies that such cause of action does not affect a contractor's or subcontractor's right to withhold payment for failure to properly perform labor or furnish materials and that any contractual provision that allows a party to withhold funds due on one contract for alleged claims or damages due on another contract is void as against public policy.
Title
Mechanics' liens; right to withhold payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 30-N 1-A) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0873) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 873 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB208ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (66-Y 30-N 1-A) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House (66-Y 30-N 1-A) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102138D |