VA SB228 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Summary
Mandatory child abuse reporters; EMS personnel. Adds emergency medical services personnel certified by the Board of Health to the list of mandatory reporters of child abuse and neglect and requires emergency medical services personnel to report child abuse and neglect to the Department of Social Services, unless such personnel immediately reports the matter directly to the attending physician at the hospital to which the child is transported, who shall make such report forthwith.
Title
Child abuse and neglect; emergency medical services personnel added to list of mandatory reporters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 268 (effective - see bill) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB228ER) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-20 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-19 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB228S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 084098272-S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 084098272-S1 | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084065272 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB228 |