VA SB23 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; adjudication of delinquency. Specifies that a delinquent child is a child 11 years of age or older who has committed a delinquent act. Currently, there is no minimum age for a child to be adjudicated delinquent. The bill provides that if a juvenile younger than 11 years of age is found to have committed a delinquent act, the juvenile shall not be proceeded upon as delinquent; however, the court may make any orders of disposition authorized for a child in need of services or a child in need of supervision. The bill includes in the definition of "child in need of services" a child younger than 11 years of age who has committed a delinquent act. Juveniles; adjudication of delinquency. Specifies that a delinquent child is a child 11 years of age or older who has committed a delinquent act. Currently, there is no minimum age for a child to be adjudicated delinquent. The bill provides that if a juvenile younger than 11 years of age is found to have committed a delinquent act, the juvenile shall not be proceeded upon as delinquent; however, the court may make any orders of disposition authorized for a child in need of services or a child in need of supervision. The bill includes in the definition of "child in need of services" a child younger than 11 years of age who has committed a delinquent act. Finally, the bill includes in the offense of causing or encouraging acts rendering children delinquent, abused, etc., any person 18 years of age or older, including the parent of any child, who willfully contributes to, encourages, or causes any act, omission, or condition that causes a child younger than 11 years of age to commit a delinquent act. Under current law, any person who commits such offense is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Juveniles; adjudication of delinquency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 4-N 3-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 4-N 3-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Requires 2/3 members present |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB23ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Title replaced 24107802D-H1 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB23H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107802D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107802D-H1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24103423D-E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB23E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 4-N 3-A) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2023-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103423D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1420 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.9:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 371 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |