VA SB231 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB216-Edwards) (14-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB216-Edwards) (14-Y 0-N)
Summary
Involuntary mental health treatment; purchase of firearms; reporting to Central Criminal Records Exchange. Clarifies that orders for both involuntary inpatient and outpatient mental health treatment must be forwarded by the clerk of court to the Central Criminal Records Exchange, and that persons ordered to either involuntary inpatient or outpatient treatment are prohibited from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm. This bill codifies Executive Order 50 (2007). This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Involuntary mental health treatment; prohibition from purchasing, etc. firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB216-Edwards) (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 085907272 |
Same As/Similar To
SB216 (Similar To) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Subjects
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Weapons
Criminal Procedure
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Weapons
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB231 |