VA SB231 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local regulation of taxicabs. Disallows counties, cities, and towns from reducing the number of taxicabs that are permitted or authorized under the local ordinance, except for non-use or cause as defined by the ordinance.
Title
Taxicabs; local regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105) | |
2012-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB231ER) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12101214D-E | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB231E | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Herring agreed to | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Amendment #1 by Senator Herring withdrawn | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101214D |
Same As/Similar To
HB865 (Same As) 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)