VA SB237 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; wine liter tax. Requires the portion of the wine liter tax collected from the sale of wine produced by farm wineries to be deposited in the Virginia Wine Promotion Fund for use by the Wine Board.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; portion of wine liter tax collected to be deposited in Wine Promotion Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB237ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102396D |