VA SB245 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive community colleges; dual enrollment agreements. Requires each comprehensive community college to enter into agreements with the local school divisions it serves to facilitate dual enrollment of eligible students into a Career Pathways program preparing students to pass a high school equivalency examination offered by the local school division and a postsecondary credential, certification, or license attainment program offered by the comprehensive community college.
Title
Comprehensive community colleges; dual enrollment of students into Career Pathways program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 645 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB245ER) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16100391D-E |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB245E |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100391D |