VA SB292 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sediment reduction credits. Authorizes Municipal Separate Storm Sewer System (MS4) permittees to acquire and use sediment reduction credits as part of a compliance strategy for implementing the Chesapeake Bay TMDL. Currently, MS4s have similar authority for nitrogen and phosphorus; the bill adds a third pollutant, sediment. The sediment credits cannot be used if they are associated with phosphorus credits used in stormwater nonpoint nutrient runoff water quality criteria.
Title
Sediment reduction credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008) | |
2016-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 23, 2016 | |
2016-02-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/16/16 |
2016-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB292ER) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB292S1 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104664D-S1 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104664D-S1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101611D |
Same As/Similar To
HB438 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0126)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.19:21.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |