VA SB307 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reduced cigarette ignition propensity. Eliminates an exemption that currently allows retailers to sell from their inventory cigarettes that do not comply with reduced ignition propensity standards if the cigarettes were stamped prior to January 1, 2010, which was the effective date of the legislation establishing the standards. This measure provides that retailers will not be subject to the requirements regarding the sale of reduced ignition propensity cigarettes only with respect to sales occurring prior to January 1, 2013.
Title
Reduced cigarette ignition propensity; eliminates an exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195) | |
2012-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 195 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB307ER) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-0Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12103658D-E | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB307E | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103658D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1088 (Same As) 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)